Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/18/2021 at 23:25:17 (UTC).

DIAZ, STEPHANIE VS AGUILAR, ARTURO JOSE

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 DIAZ, STEPHANIE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against AGUILAR, ARTURO JOSE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STREIMER, LAURA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0322

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STREIMER, LAURA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DIAZ STEPHANIE

Respondent

AGUILAR ARTURO JOSE

 

Court Documents

Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

4/19/2021: Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

4/19/2021: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Minute Order

4/19/2021: Minute Order

Response - Domestic Violence

4/8/2021: Response - Domestic Violence

Proof of Service

4/9/2021: Proof of Service

Proof of Service - Mail - DV120

4/12/2021: Proof of Service - Mail - DV120

FCS-Mediation Memo

4/14/2021: FCS-Mediation Memo

Response - Domestic Violence

4/5/2021: Response - Domestic Violence

Proof of Service - Mail - DV-120

4/8/2021: Proof of Service - Mail - DV-120

Certificate of Completion - Our Children First

4/5/2021: Certificate of Completion - Our Children First

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

3/25/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Request - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation)

3/25/2021: Request - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

3/25/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

3/25/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Granted

3/25/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Granted

FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

3/25/2021: FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department D, Streimer, Laura, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing (Form 130); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (DV120 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketResponse - Domestic Violence; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (DV-120 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketResponse - Domestic Violence; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Completion (Our Children First ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (Granted ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less