Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2021 at 06:24:37 (UTC).

DIAZ-CHAVEZ, JESUS VS RAMIREZ, FREDDY WILLIAM, JR

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 DIAZ-CHAVEZ, JESUS filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against RAMIREZ, FREDDY WILLIAM, JR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SWIFT, DAVID W.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1430

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SWIFT, DAVID W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DIAZ-CHAVEZ JESUS

Respondent

RAMIREZ FREDDY WILLIAM JR

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

4/16/2021: Minute Order

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

3/25/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

3/25/2021: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

3/25/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

3/25/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 25, Swift, David W., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less