Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2019 at 03:48:01 (UTC).

DIANNE C MEADS VS MINOH KIM

Case Summary

On 10/27/2017 DIANNE C MEADS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MINOH KIM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1560

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MEADS DIANNE C.

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 10

KIM MINOH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GORDON ERIC S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

4/12/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

4/29/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

4/29/2019: Minute Order

Order - Dismissal

4/29/2019: Order - Dismissal

SUMMONS

10/27/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE PERSONAL INJURY

10/27/2017: COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE PERSONAL INJURY

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Jury Trial) of 04/29/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Order - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE PERSONAL INJURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by DIANNE C. MEADS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GORDON, ERIC S.