This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/26/2022 at 18:35:44 (UTC).

DIANNE BENAUGH VS MANGEN ENTERPRISES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/03/2019 DIANNE BENAUGH filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against MANGEN ENTERPRISES, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DANIEL M. CROWLEY and EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9154

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BENAUGH DIANNE

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

MANGEN GROUP INC.

MANGEN ENTERPRISES INC.

Cross Defendant

DOES 1 TO 25 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ESFANDI SIMON

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

STRUCK ROBERT WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

7/11/2022: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

6/16/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

6/16/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Request for Dismissal

8/10/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

8/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

6/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

Notice of Ruling

6/16/2021: Notice of Ruling

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

2/25/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

2/25/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

6/3/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO ...)

2/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO ...)

Cross-Complaint

1/16/2020: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

1/16/2020: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Demand for Jury Trial

12/4/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/4/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

12/4/2019: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/6/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/6/2019: PI General Order

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • Hearing01/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • Hearing01/18/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Dianne Benaugh (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (as to the Cross-Complaint) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Mangen Group, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Mangen Enterprises, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Mangen Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant); Mangen Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Mangen Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant); Mangen Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Mangen Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant); Mangen Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Mangen Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant); Mangen Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dianne Benaugh (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Dianne Benaugh (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dianne Benaugh (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less