Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2021 at 07:28:36 (UTC).

DIANE WASHINGTON-WILKERSON, ET AL. VS HOME PRO REMODELING AND CONSTRUCTION INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 DIANE WASHINGTON-WILKERSON filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against HOME PRO REMODELING AND CONSTRUCTION INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1396

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILKERSON CLEM

WASHINGTON-WILKERSON DIANE

Defendant

HOME PRO REMODELING AND CONSTRUCTION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GEER GREGORY B.

STONE JASON M.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/9/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/25/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/24/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/24/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • Hearing07/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by DIANE WASHINGTON-WILKERSON (Plaintiff); CLEM WILKERSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DIANE WASHINGTON-WILKERSON (Plaintiff); CLEM WILKERSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DIANE WASHINGTON-WILKERSON (Plaintiff); CLEM WILKERSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by DIANE WASHINGTON-WILKERSON (Plaintiff); CLEM WILKERSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GEER GREGORY B.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STONE JASON M.