This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/05/2020 at 09:54:41 (UTC).

DIANE TAREN VS LUSHANNA ROSE

Case Summary

On 05/01/2018 DIANE TAREN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LUSHANNA ROSE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4567

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TAREN DIANE

Defendants and Respondents

ROSE LUSHANNA

DOES 1-100

ROSE LOUSHANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF GERALD L. MARCUS

MARCUS GERALD LEE

Defendant Attorneys

RODRIGUEZ WALTER A.

ATANOUS CLEIDIN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/3/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

3/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL) OF 03/13/2020

3/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL) OF 03/13/2020

Association of Attorney

2/5/2020: Association of Attorney

Notice - NOTICE OF MOTION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE

2/11/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF MOTION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

9/6/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/10/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service of Summons

11/2/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service by Mail

11/2/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration - Declaration of Diligence

11/2/2018: Declaration - Declaration of Diligence

Demand for Jury Trial

12/20/2018: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

12/20/2018: Answer

Notice of Change of Firm Name

1/24/2019: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice of Deposit - Jury

4/24/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

SUMMONS -

5/1/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

5/1/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Diane Taren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial) of 03/13/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNotice (of motion to continue the trial date); Filed by Loushana Rose (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Loushana Rose (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Loushana Rose (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Diane Taren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Loushana Rose (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Loushana Rose (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Loushana Rose (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Loushana Rose (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of Diligence; Filed by Diane Taren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Diane Taren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Diane Taren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Diane Taren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC704567    Hearing Date: March 13, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

DIANE TAREN,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

LUSHANNA ROSE, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC704567

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT’S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Dept. 31

1:30 p.m.

March 13, 2020

Plaintiff, Diane Taren filed this action against Defendant, Lushanna Rose for damages arising out of premises liability. Plaintiff filed the lawsuit on 5/01/18. The parties once previously stipulated to continue the trial date, which is now set for 5/04/20.

At this time, Defendant moves to continue the trial date from 5/04/20 for four months. Defendant shows the continuance is necessary because she has not been able to, despite best efforts, complete all necessary discovery in the case. Notably, Plaintiff’s IME has been rescheduled multiple times, and is now scheduled for 4/26/20. The motion is unopposed.

The Court finds the moving papers sufficiently show good cause to continue the trial date. The 5/04/20 trial date is advanced to today’s date and continued to Tuesday, 9/15/20 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 31 of the Spring Street Courthouse. The 4/23/20 FSC date is advanced to today’s date and continued to Tuesday, 8/31/20 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 31.

All discovery and expert cut-offs are extended to reflect the new trial date.

Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.

Dated this 13th day of March, 2020

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court