This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/08/2022 at 09:54:21 (UTC).

DIANE LARK, ET AL. VS STATE FARM INSURANCE CLAIMS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 DIANE LARK filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM INSURANCE CLAIMS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3891

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LARK DIANE

LOUIS CAMERON

Defendants

STATE FARM INSURANCE CLAIMS

WINTER THECA FERDINAND

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/25/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

7/25/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

7/25/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/25/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/25/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/25/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/25/2022: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2024
  • Hearing07/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2024
  • Hearing01/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2024
  • Hearing01/08/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DIANE LARK (Plaintiff); CAMERON LOUIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DIANE LARK (Plaintiff); CAMERON LOUIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Insurance is a litigant