This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2023 at 13:55:37 (UTC).

DIANA XIMENA CASTILLO-EDDY VS AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 DIANA XIMENA CASTILLO-EDDY filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO , INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL L. LOFTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0387

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOEL L. LOFTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASTILLO-EDDY DIANA XIMENA

Defendant

AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSON KEVIN

Defendant Attorney

TAHSILDOOST SOHEYL

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/23/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/23/2023: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/23/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/23/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/24/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/24/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

3/3/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

4/11/2023: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

5/4/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2023
  • Hearing07/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department X at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X updated: Result Date to 05/04/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: Diana Ximena Castillo-Eddy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Diana Ximena Castillo-Eddy (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 03/02/2023; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Joel L. Lofton in Department X Alhambra Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Diana Ximena Castillo-Eddy (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Diana Ximena Castillo-Eddy (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Diana Ximena Castillo-Eddy (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less