This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/29/2020 at 02:18:44 (UTC).

DIANA PHAM VS CHIN KIM, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/15/2019 DIANA PHAM filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CHIN KIM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANTHONY MOHR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6941

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANTHONY MOHR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHAM DIANA

Defendants

DCH TORRANCE IMPORTS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA DCH TOYOTA OF TORRANCE

KIM CHIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELIHU KAVEH S.

Defendant Attorneys

HOLLOWAY KEVIN B.

MANN JERRY H.

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/23/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW REGARDING FILING OF SUPPLEMENTAL B...)

2/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW REGARDING FILING OF SUPPLEMENTAL B...)

Notice of Motion

2/4/2020: Notice of Motion

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/4/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KBH ISO MTN FOR APPT OF NEUTRAL ARBITRATOR

2/4/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KBH ISO MTN FOR APPT OF NEUTRAL ARBITRATOR

Request for Judicial Notice

2/7/2020: Request for Judicial Notice

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CHIN KIMS REQUEST THAT THE COURT ORDER HIM TO JOIN THE PREVIOUSLY ORDERED ARBITRATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

2/7/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CHIN KIMS REQUEST THAT THE COURT ORDER HIM TO JOIN THE PREVIOUSLY ORDERED ARBITRATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Brief - BRIEF DEFENDANT DCH TORRANCE IMPORTS, INC.'S POST STATUS CONFERENCE BRIEF ISO COMPELLING DEFENDANT CHIN KIM TO ARBITRATION

2/7/2020: Brief - BRIEF DEFENDANT DCH TORRANCE IMPORTS, INC.'S POST STATUS CONFERENCE BRIEF ISO COMPELLING DEFENDANT CHIN KIM TO ARBITRATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

1/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT CHIN KIM'S STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND REQUEST THAT THE COURT ORDER DEFENDANT KIM TO JOIN THE PREVIOUSLY ORDERED ARBITRATION

1/21/2020: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT CHIN KIM'S STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND REQUEST THAT THE COURT ORDER DEFENDANT KIM TO JOIN THE PREVIOUSLY ORDERED ARBITRATION

Status Report

1/16/2020: Status Report

Substitution of Attorney

12/27/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NEW AUTHORITY

11/13/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NEW AUTHORITY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)

12/5/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF THUY NGUYEN IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

7/1/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF THUY NGUYEN IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

Notice of Hearing on Petition

7/1/2019: Notice of Hearing on Petition

Proof of Personal Service

6/11/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Complaint

5/15/2019: Complaint

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 54, Anthony Mohr, Presiding; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation Re Selection of Neutral Arbitrator); Filed by DCH Torrance Imports Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department 96; Hearing on Motion - Other (Motion for Appointment of Neutral Arbitrator) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department 96; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion - Other Motion for Appointment of Neutral A...) of 07/27/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion for Appointment of Neutral A...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketStatus Report; Filed by Diana Pham (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 96; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketNotice ( of Errata re: Exhibit B Tab in Petition to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings Filed By Defendant); Filed by DCH Torrance Imports Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by DCH Torrance Imports Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by DCH Torrance Imports Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketPetition (Petition to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings); Filed by DCH Torrance Imports Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Thuy Nguyen In Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings); Filed by DCH Torrance Imports Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Diana Pham (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Diana Pham (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Diana Pham (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Diana Pham (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DCH TORRANCE IMPORTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELIHU KAVEH SAM