This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/19/2022 at 11:20:57 (UTC).

DIANA MILLER VS DCM DASH ONE, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/30/2019 DIANA MILLER filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against DCM DASH ONE, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GREGORY W. ALARCON, JON R. TAKASUGI and WENDY CHANG. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8951

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GREGORY W. ALARCON

JON R. TAKASUGI

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILLER DIANA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Defendant

DCM DASH ONE INC A CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LO JUSTIN

Defendant Attorneys

GOLDSTEIN CHARLES

RICHARDSON JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (COD...)

11/12/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (COD...)

Notice of Attachment

11/4/2019: Notice of Attachment

Complaint

10/30/2019: Complaint

Request for Dismissal

2/23/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

3/1/2022: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS...)

10/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY PATRICK MARTINEZ SUBMITTED IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE: SANCTIONS SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 25, 2021

10/18/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY PATRICK MARTINEZ SUBMITTED IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE: SANCTIONS SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 25, 2021

Case Management Statement

3/4/2021: Case Management Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF VALENTINE A. SHALAMITSKI IN RESPONSE TO OSC

3/12/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF VALENTINE A. SHALAMITSKI IN RESPONSE TO OSC

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS...)

3/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS...)

Case Management Statement

7/8/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDERS

7/13/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDERS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/28/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

9/28/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

10/20/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/22/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 17, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial ((5-6 day estimate)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 17, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by DCM Dash One, Inc, a corporation doing business in California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Diana Miller, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Sanctions on Plaintiff for Failure to Appear on Case Management Conference) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF ATTORNEY PATRICK MARTINEZ SUBMITTED IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE: SANCTIONS SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 25, 2021); Filed by Diana Miller, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Diana Miller, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Docketat 3:45 PM in Department 36, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer (Cod...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer (Cod...) of 11/12/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Diana Miller, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Diana Miller, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Diana Miller, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Diana Miller, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Diana Miller, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less