This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/18/2023 at 04:34:49 (UTC).

DIANA MCKNIGHT VS PROMISES KEPT, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/22/2022 DIANA MCKNIGHT filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PROMISES KEPT, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3775

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCKNIGHT DIANA

Defendant

PROMISES KEPT INC. DBA ATARAXIS HOMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FLORES JESSICA

MYONG ROBERT S.

ROMERO ALAN

Defendant Attorney

REYNOLDS JAMES LEE

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER VACATING DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT PROMISES KEPT

3/9/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER VACATING DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT PROMISES KEPT

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION TO VACATE DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT WITH ORDER; NOTICE OF FIRST APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT

2/28/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION TO VACATE DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT WITH ORDER; NOTICE OF FIRST APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/3/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/2/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Answer

3/2/2023: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/02/2023

3/2/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/02/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/8/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

1/24/2023: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/19/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

12/29/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/21/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail

12/6/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

11/28/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Case Management Statement

11/21/2022: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/3/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration re: Due Diligence

10/4/2022: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/26/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2023
  • Hearing04/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • Hearing04/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- STIPULATION TO VACATE DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT WITH ORDER; NOTICE OF FIRST APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT: As To Parties changed from Diana McKnight (Plaintiff) to Diana McKnight (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Court Order Vacating Default of Defendant Promises Kept; Filed by: PROMISES KEPT, INC. (Defendant); As to: PROMISES KEPT, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: PROMISES KEPT, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: PROMISES KEPT, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 03/02/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Diana McKnight on 07/22/2022, Default entered on 01/19/2023, Vacated - .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketSTIPULATION TO VACATE DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT WITH ORDER; NOTICE OF FIRST APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT; Signed and Filed by: PROMISES KEPT, INC. (Defendant); As to: Diana McKnight (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Diana McKnight (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Teresa A. Beaudet in Department 50 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Diana McKnight (Plaintiff); As to: PROMISES KEPT, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Diana McKnight (Plaintiff); As to: PROMISES KEPT, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Diana McKnight (Plaintiff); As to: PROMISES KEPT, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less