This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/13/2018 at 13:24:14 (UTC).

DIANA I TREJO VS NISSAN NORTH AMERICA INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/03/2017 DIANA I TREJO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NISSAN NORTH AMERICA INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6565

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TREJO DIANA I.

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 20

HNL AUTOMOTIVE INC

NISSAN NORTH AMERICA INC

HOOMAN NISSAN OF LONG BEACH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LOVASZ CHRISTOPHER M.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

SWEENEY MICHAEL P. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/2/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

10/13/2017: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY OF MERCHANTABILITY UNDER THE SONGBEVERLY WARRANTY ACT.; ETC.

4/3/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY OF MERCHANTABILITY UNDER THE SONGBEVERLY WARRANTY ACT.; ETC.

SUMMONS

4/3/2017: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/10/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/1/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/3/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DEFENDANT NISSAN N0RTH AMERICA, INC.?S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

6/19/2017: DEFENDANT NISSAN N0RTH AMERICA, INC.?S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/28/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DEFENDANT HNL AUTOMOTIVE INC. D/B/A HOOMAN NISSAN OF LONG BEACH'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

7/17/2017: DEFENDANT HNL AUTOMOTIVE INC. D/B/A HOOMAN NISSAN OF LONG BEACH'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

7/19/2017: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Unknown

7/19/2017: Unknown

Unknown

7/19/2017: Unknown

Unknown

7/26/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

8/10/2017: Minute Order

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2018
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (COMPLAINT ENTIRE ACTION WP ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • Notice-Settlement; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Trial Date Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Statement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Receipt; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Notice (POSTING JURY FEES ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Statement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Answer to Complaint (NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC.; HNL AUTOMOTIVE INC DBA HOOMAN NISSAN OF LONG BEACH ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Answer to Complaint (NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOOMAN NISSAN OF LONG BEACH (DOE 61) is a litigant

Latest cases where HNL AUTOMOTIVE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Nissan North America Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SWEENEY MICHAEL P