This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/14/2022 at 18:06:26 (UTC).

DIANA GOMEZ VS CALDERA MEDICAL, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/06/2022 DIANA GOMEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against CALDERA MEDICAL, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CHRISTOPHER K. LUI, DAVID J. COWAN and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8790

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

DAVID J. COWAN

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOMEZ DIANA

Defendant

CALDERA MEDICAL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FRISCH WENDI J.

FLYNN FRANCIS J. "CASEY" JR.

 

Court Documents

Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR WILLIAM R. STUART III TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE [RES. ID #2499]

10/31/2022: Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR WILLIAM R. STUART III TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE [RES. ID #2499]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE FOR WILLIAM R. ...)

12/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE FOR WILLIAM R. ...)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANT CALDERA MEDICAL, INC.S APPLICATION FOR WILLIAM R. STUART III, TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

11/7/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANT CALDERA MEDICAL, INC.S APPLICATION FOR WILLIAM R. STUART III, TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

11/7/2022: Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

11/7/2022: Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

10/31/2022: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/24/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Answer

10/21/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/21/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/17/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 10/05/2022

10/5/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 10/05/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

10/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: REASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO NON-COMPLEX DETERMIN...) OF 10/06/2022

10/6/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: REASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO NON-COMPLEX DETERMIN...) OF 10/06/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO NON-COMPLEX DETERMIN...)

10/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO NON-COMPLEX DETERMIN...)

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

9/9/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Complaint

9/6/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/6/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/6/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2023
  • Hearing01/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice for William R. Stuart III [Res. ID #2499]: Filed By: Caldera Medical, Inc. (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 12/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice for William R. ...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice for William R. Stuart III for Defendant Caldera Medical, Inc. [Res. ID# 717416512499] scheduled for 12/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 76 updated: Result Date to 12/08/2022; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketAddress for Wendi J. Frisch (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Appearance NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE; Filed by: Caldera Medical, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Appearance NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE; Filed by: Caldera Medical, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketNotice OF CONTINUED HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANT CALDERA MEDICAL, INC.S APPLICATION FOR WILLIAM R. STUART III, TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE; Filed by: Caldera Medical, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Diana Gomez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice scheduled for 12/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 76

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice scheduled for 11/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 76 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 12/08/2022 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by: Diana Gomez (Plaintiff); As to: Caldera Medical, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 09/07/2022; Service Cost: 96.40; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Diana Gomez (Plaintiff); As to: Caldera Medical, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Diana Gomez (Plaintiff); As to: Caldera Medical, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Diana Gomez (Plaintiff); As to: Caldera Medical, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Diana Gomez (Plaintiff); As to: Caldera Medical, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALDERA MEDICAL INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRISCH WENDI J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FLYNN JR., FRANCIS J.