This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2021 at 15:20:10 (UTC).

DIANA FERNANDEZ VS BAKER COMMODITIES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 DIANA FERNANDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BAKER COMMODITIES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are EDWARD B. MORETON and WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6097

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

EDWARD B. MORETON

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FERNANDEZ DIANA

Defendants

BAKER COMMODITIES INC.

NARCISO SALDANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEIGER LOWELL ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL CHRISTINA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/21/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/22/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

10/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

10/1/2020: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

10/28/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/28/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

10/23/2020: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/23/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEMANDS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

1/20/2021: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEMANDS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO INTERROGATORIES

1/20/2021: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO INTERROGATORIES

Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA

9/9/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2023
  • Hearing09/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • Hearing03/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • Hearing03/07/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Errata); Filed by Baker Commodities, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel (PLAINTIFF?S RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS;); Filed by Baker Commodities, Inc. (Defendant); Saldana Narciso (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel (PLAINTIFF?S RESPONSE TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS;); Filed by Baker Commodities, Inc. (Defendant); Saldana Narciso (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Diana Fernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Diana Fernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Baker Commodities, Inc. (Defendant); Saldana Narciso (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Baker Commodities, Inc. (Defendant); Saldana Narciso (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Diana Fernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Diana Fernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Diana Fernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAKER COMMODITIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL CHRISTINA