This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/03/2019 at 10:13:03 (UTC).

DIANA FARAJOLLAHZADEH, LLC VS STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COIMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/26/2019 DIANA FARAJOLLAHZADEH, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COIMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY W. ALARCON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6449

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY W. ALARCON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIANA FARAJOLLAHZADEH A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION LLC

Defendant

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COIMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GAUMER CHRISTIE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/26/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/26/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/26/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/26/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE MATTER IS CALLED FOR HEARING.)

10/24/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE MATTER IS CALLED FOR HEARING.)

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/5/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE MATTER IS CALLED FOR HEARING.)

11/22/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE MATTER IS CALLED FOR HEARING.)

Proof of Personal Service

11/21/2019: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • Hearing01/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference Matter is called for hearing.)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Diana Farajollahzadeh, a California Corporation LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference Matter is called for hearing.)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Diana Farajollahzadeh, a California Corporation LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Diana Farajollahzadeh, a California Corporation LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Diana Farajollahzadeh, a California Corporation LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIANA FARAJOLLAHZADEH LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm General Insurance Company is a litigant