This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/19/2020 at 02:12:50 (UTC).

DIANA CHANG ET AL VS FRILLY INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/30/2018 DIANA CHANG filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against FRILLY INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7725

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

CHANG DIANA

SMART JUSTYNA

Defendants and Respondents

FRILLY INC.

DING SHANGWEI

DOES 1-100

Not Classified By Court

ATKINSON ANDELSON LOYA RUUD AND ROMO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

IARUSSO & DAGHER

IARUSSO MICHELLE

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ATKINSON ANDELSON LOYA RUUD & ROMO APC

JUDGE JONATHAN

HSU RAY

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF RAY HSU RE INSURANCE COVERAGE FOR DEFENDANTS

8/20/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF RAY HSU RE INSURANCE COVERAGE FOR DEFENDANTS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

8/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/27/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Substitution of Attorney

2/18/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 01/03/2020

1/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 01/03/2020

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

9/30/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Notice of Ruling

10/23/2019: Notice of Ruling

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

10/24/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

10/24/2019: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

10/24/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Order - ORDER RE MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

12/3/2019: Order - ORDER RE MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE OPPOSTION

6/10/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE OPPOSTION

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF MARTIN S. LI

6/10/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF MARTIN S. LI

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE)

6/14/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE)

Order - ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION

6/14/2019: Order - ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

4/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

9/28/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/26/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • Hearing11/10/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • Hearing10/29/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • Hearing10/22/2021 at 16:00 PM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • Hearing08/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Status Conference (re whether to order an MSC) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Docketat 10:48 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Frilly Inc. (Defendant); Shangwei Ding (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Frilly Inc. (Defendant); Shangwei Ding (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANTS FRILLY INC.'S AND SHANGWEI DING'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Diana Chang (Plaintiff); Justyna Smart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Diana Chang (Plaintiff); Justyna Smart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF THE FEHA; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC707725    Hearing Date: December 03, 2019    Dept: 50

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 50

DIANA CHANG, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

vs.

frilly inc., et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.:

BC 707725

Hearing Date:

December 3, 2019

Hearing Time:

8:30 a.m.

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE:

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Jonathan Judge and Martin S. Li of Atkinson, Andelson, Loya, Ruud & Romo (“Counsel”) move to be relieved as counsel of record for Defendant Shangwei Ding (“Ding”). The Court finds that Counsel has complied with the relevant procedural requirements (CRC 3.1362) and has provided sufficient reason for withdrawal. Therefore, the Court grants the motion. Counsel is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

DATED: December 3, 2019

________________________________

Hon. Teresa A. Beaudet

Judge, Los Angeles Superior Court