Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/20/2019 at 19:09:10 (UTC).

DIANA C. LEE VS. DR. HSU ORGANIC GROUP, ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/30/2017 DIANA C LEE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DR HSU ORGANIC GROUP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3156

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DIANA C. LEE

LEE DIANA C.

Defendants and Respondents

BROTHERS FARM INC.

DOES 1 TO 3

HSU SHIHLIN (SLING HSU)

DR. HSU ORGANIC GROUP

HSU SHIHLIN SLING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

THE ALBERTS FIRM

LAW OFFICES OF ALAN D. IRWIN

 

Court Documents

2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/30/2017: 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF MOTION AND DEMURRE TO PLAINTIFFS'' COMPLAINT

5/30/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND DEMURRE TO PLAINTIFFS'' COMPLAINT

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

8/24/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

COMPLAINT-CONTRACT -

5/30/2017: COMPLAINT-CONTRACT -

Proof of Service -

5/30/2017: Proof of Service -

NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

5/30/2017: NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

ANSWER-CONTRACT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT DR. HSU ORGANIC GROUP AND

5/30/2017: ANSWER-CONTRACT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT DR. HSU ORGANIC GROUP AND

ORDER TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TINE FOR DEMURRER-WITH MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' LEAVE TO FILE COMPULSORY CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/30/2017: ORDER TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TINE FOR DEMURRER-WITH MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' LEAVE TO FILE COMPULSORY CROSS-COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF MOTION AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS'' COMPLAINT

5/30/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS'' COMPLAINT

AMENDED SUMMONS

5/30/2017: AMENDED SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULAT/CLERK'S JUDGMENT

5/30/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULAT/CLERK'S JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF MOTION AND DEMURRE TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/30/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND DEMURRE TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE COMPULSORY CROSSCOMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF DR. SI{IHLIN HSU; AND PROPOSED CROSS- COMPLAINT;

5/30/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE COMPULSORY CROSSCOMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF DR. SI{IHLIN HSU; AND PROPOSED CROSS- COMPLAINT;

Minute Order -

5/30/2017: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

5/30/2017: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

5/30/2017: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

5/30/2017: Minute Order -

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

7/25/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • Hearing09/29/2020 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • Hearing09/21/2020 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • Hearing07/21/2020 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61; Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-09-25 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61; Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketOPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFENDANT DIANA C. LEETS DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketANSWER-CONTRACT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT DR. HSU ORGANIC GROUP AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION AND DEMURRER TO DEFENDANTS' CROSS-COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND PROPOSED NOT GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketAMENDED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION AND DEMURRE TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC663156    Hearing Date: October 01, 2020    Dept: 61

Cal. Code of Civ. Proc. (“CCP”) section 284 states that “[t]he attorney in an action or special proceeding may be changed at any time before or after judgment or final determination” upon either consent of both client and attorney, or upon the order of the court under application of either the client of the attorney, after notice from one to the other. Cal. Rule of Court 3.1362 states the requirements for a motion to be relieved as counsel under CCP section 284. No memorandum is required, but the motion must be accompanied by (1) a declaration stating why a motion has been brought instead of filing a consent (without compromising attorney-client confidentiality), (2) proof of service of the motion, and (3) all hearing dates scheduled in the action or proceeding, including the date of trial, if know. Additionally, “[t]he proposed order relieving counsel must be prepared on the Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel--Civil (form MC-053) and must be lodged with the court with the moving papers.”

The present motion pertains attorney Alan D. Irwin’s, counsel for defendants and cross-Complainants Shihlin Sling Hsu, Brothers Farm Inc., and Dr. Hsu Organic Farm Group. The motion complies with all of the above requirements.

Attorney Alan D. Irwin’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for Defendants and Cross-Complainants Shihlin Sling Hsu, Brothers Farm Inc., and Dr. Hsu Organic Farm Group is GRANTED.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Brothers Farms Inc is a litigant