This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/11/2020 at 09:53:10 (UTC).

DIANA BEATRIZ QUINTEROS RUIZ VS HONDA MOTOR COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/23/2018 DIANA BEATRIZ QUINTEROS RUIZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against HONDA MOTOR COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2044

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUINTEROS RUIZ DIANA BEATRIZ

Defendants

HONDA MOTOR COMPANY

HONDA RESEARCH INSTITUTE JAPAN CO. LTD.

AMERICA HONDA MOTOR COMPANY INC.

HONDA RESEARCH INSTITUTE USA INC.

HONDA NORTH AMERICA INC.

HONDA R&D CO LTD.

HONDA R&D AMERICAS INC.

HONDA ENGINEERING NORTH AMERICA INC.

HONDA ENGINEERING CO. LTD.

HONDA OF AMERICA MANUFACTURING INC.

Not Classified By Court

HONDA MOTOR CO. LTD. INCORRECTLY NAMED AS HONDA MOTOR COMPANY LTD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

HOSTETLER HARRY FRANKLIN

CHASE BRIAN DOSTER

HILST STEVEN

WU NATASHA M.

HSIAO LISA R.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Outgoing Transfer

1/10/2020: Notice of Outgoing Transfer

Receipt for Transmitted Record

1/10/2020: Receipt for Transmitted Record

Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER - LEANDRA AMBER, CSR #12070

12/16/2019: Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER - LEANDRA AMBER, CSR #12070

Order - ORDER - COURT'S ORDER ON MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY TO FRESNO COUNTY

12/16/2019: Order - ORDER - COURT'S ORDER ON MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY TO FRESNO COUNTY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY S...)

12/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY S...)

Notice - NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC. AND HONDA R&D AMERICAS, INC.'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND PROOF OF PAYMENT OF TRANSFER FEES

12/18/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC. AND HONDA R&D AMERICAS, INC.'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND PROOF OF PAYMENT OF TRANSFER FEES

Case Management Statement

11/25/2019: Case Management Statement

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT TO FRESNO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLA

12/3/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT TO FRESNO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLA

Case Management Statement

12/4/2019: Case Management Statement

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC. AND HONDA R&D AMERICAS, INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT TO FRESNO SUPERIOR COURT

12/9/2019: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC. AND HONDA R&D AMERICAS, INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT TO FRESNO SUPERIOR COURT

Request for Refund / Order

10/4/2019: Request for Refund / Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/17/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

9/18/2019: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/12/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

8/27/2019: Case Management Statement

Motion to Transfer - MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT TO FRESNO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT

8/30/2019: Motion to Transfer - MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT TO FRESNO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT

Case Management Statement

8/30/2019: Case Management Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE; DECLARATION OF H. FRANKLIN HOSTETLER, III

8/30/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE; DECLARATION OF H. FRANKLIN HOSTETLER, III

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketReceipt for Transmitted Record; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Outgoing Transfer; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Ruling on Defendants American Honda Motor Co., Inc. and Honda R&D Americas, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue and Proof of Payment of Transfer Fees); Filed by America Honda Motor Company, Inc. (Defendant); Honda R&D Americas, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Hearing on Motion to Transfer (Venue from Los Angeles County Superior Court to Fresno, Filed by Defendant America Honda Motor Co., Inc.;) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter (- Leandra Amber, CSR #12070)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketOrder (- Court's Order on Motion to Transfer Venue from Los Angeles County to Fresno County); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Transfer Venue from Los Angeles County S...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketReply (Defendants American Honda Motor Co., Inc. and Honda R&D Americas, Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion to Transfer Venue from Los Angeles County Superior Court to Fresno Superior Court); Filed by Honda Motor Company (Defendant); America Honda Motor Company, Inc. (Defendant); Honda R&D Americas, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Diana Beatriz Quinteros Ruiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Diana Beatriz Quinteros Ruiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Diana Beatriz Quinteros Ruiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Diana Beatriz Quinteros Ruiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Diana Beatriz Quinteros Ruiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Diana Beatriz Quinteros Ruiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Diana Beatriz Quinteros Ruiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Diana Beatriz Quinteros Ruiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Diana Beatriz Quinteros Ruiz (Plaintiff); Honda R&D Co,, LTD. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HONDA ENGINEERING NORTH AMERICA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HONDA R&D AMERICAS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Honda North America, Inc. is a litigant