This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/02/2021 at 00:19:47 (UTC).

DIANA AGHAKHANI, ET AL. VS GREEN E & B, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 DIANA AGHAKHANI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GREEN E B, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9872

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

AGHAKHANI DIANA

KALSYANS OJAN

GREEN E & B INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants and Cross Defendants

GREEN E & B INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KLAIN LIOR

LEVI MENAHEM

WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAROOTIAN SHARICE

Defendant Attorney

PAGAN JOHN M.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/12/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/24/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

9/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/20/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

General Denial

9/29/2021: General Denial

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

9/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

9/29/2021: Cross-Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • Hearing12/06/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY, a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY, a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY, a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by DIANA AGHAKHANI (Plaintiff); OJAN KALSYANS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by DIANA AGHAKHANI (Plaintiff); OJAN KALSYANS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by DIANA AGHAKHANI (Plaintiff); OJAN KALSYANS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DIANA AGHAKHANI (Plaintiff); OJAN KALSYANS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DIANA AGHAKHANI (Plaintiff); OJAN KALSYANS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAGAN JOHN