This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2019 at 01:08:37 (UTC).

DIAMOND BANK PLC VS ROBERT DYSON & DIKET LIMITED ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/11/2018 DIAMOND BANK PLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against ROBERT DYSON DIKET LIMITED. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5646

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIAMOND BANK PLC

Defendants

ODOGWU CHIEF SONNY

SIO PROPERTIES LIMITED

ROBERT DYSON & DIKET LIMITED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

NWABUZOR EMMANUEL ESQ.

NWABUZOR OSENWOKWU EMMANUEL ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR ENTRY OF CALIFORNIA COURT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO THE UNIFORM FOREIGN JUDGMENT RECOGNITION ACT

5/11/2018: COMPLAINT FOR ENTRY OF CALIFORNIA COURT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO THE UNIFORM FOREIGN JUDGMENT RECOGNITION ACT

SUMMONS

5/11/2018: SUMMONS

Minute Order

4/19/2019: Minute Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

2/8/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order

11/5/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/7/2018: Minute Order

RESPONSIVE DECLARATION OF EMMANUEL NWABUZOR RE OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

9/6/2018: RESPONSIVE DECLARATION OF EMMANUEL NWABUZOR RE OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

Minute Order

7/26/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

5/14/2018: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Case Management Conference ((cf 3/13/19)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference (cf 3/13/19))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52; Initial Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-09-07 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketReply/Response; Filed by Diamond Bank PLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketRESPONSIVE DECLARATION OF EMMANUEL NWABUZOR RE OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52; Initial Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-07-26 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference filed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Diamond Bank PLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR ENTRY OF CALIFORNIA COURT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO THE UNIFORM FOREIGN JUDGMENT RECOGNITION ACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Emmanuel Nwabuzor, Esq. (SB# 175670) EMMANUEL NWABUZOR, APC. 3250 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90010 o flor Court of California Tel: (213) 389-3527 ounty of | oe Anneles Fax: (213) 674-8858 -

ax: (213) MA’?( 11 9018 Attdmeys for Plaintiff, - Sherri R, ¢ Xecutive Offi Diamond Bank PLC By, ficerClerk

S den puty

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

DIAMOND BANK, PLC, Case No.:g

Plaintiffs, COMPLAINT FOR ENTRY OF CALIFORNIA Vs. COURT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO THE ROBERT DYSON & DIKET LIMITED SIO Braoeona o JUDGMENT PROPERTIES LIMITED; CHIEF SONNY RECOGNITION ACT ODOGWU; and DOES 1 TO 30, Inclusive,

Defendants,

. Plaintiff, DIAMOND BANK PLC., for its complaint for entry of a California court judgment pursuant to the Uniform Foreign Judgment Recognition Act arising from a final judgment from the court of the Federal Republic of Nigeria, hereby alleges against Defendants as

follows:

1. Plaintiff, DIAMOND BANK PLC “Plaintiff™) is and at all times relevant hereto was a corporation established under the laws of the Federal Republic of Nigeria. Plaintiff is a

publicly traded company in the Nigeria Stock Exchange.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIAMOND BANK PLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NWABUZOR OSENWOKWU EMMANUEL ESQ.