This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/20/2022 at 02:35:03 (UTC).

DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC. VS MAZIK LLC

Case Summary

On 07/07/2022 DHL EXPRESS USA , INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MAZIK LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1989

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DHL EXPRESS USA INC.

Defendant

MAZIK LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCDERMOTT PHILIP

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/7/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

7/7/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/7/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/7/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/7/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/7/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/7/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/15/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/15/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Stipulation and Order - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT COURT SHALL RETAIN JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 664.6

11/18/2022: Stipulation and Order - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT COURT SHALL RETAIN JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 664.6

Order - Dismissal

11/18/2022: Order - Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement; Stipulation and Order that Court Shall Retain Jurisdiction to Enforce Settlement Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 664.6: Status Date changed from 11/18/2022 to 11/18/2022; Filed By: DHL Express (USA), Inc. (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Name Extension: blank; Exact Name: Notice of Settlement; Stipulation and Order that Court Shall Retain Jurisdiction to Enforce Settlement Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 664.6; Result Date: 11/18/2022; As To Parties changed from MAZIK LLC (Defendant) to MAZIK LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by DHL Express (USA), Inc. on 07/07/2022, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order Notice of Settlement; Stipulation and Order that Court Shall Retain Jurisdiction to Enforce Settlement; Signed and Filed by: DHL Express (USA), Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: MAZIK LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/29/2022 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/29/2022 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/29/2022 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/29/2022 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketAddress for Philip McDermott (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gregory Keosian in Department 61 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: DHL Express (USA), Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: MAZIK LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DHL Express (USA), Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: MAZIK LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DHL Express (USA), Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: MAZIK LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DHL EXPRESS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCDERMOTT PHILIP