This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/08/2021 at 08:00:06 (UTC).

DEYSI CRUZ VS JACK IN THE BOX, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/18/2021 DEYSI CRUZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JACK IN THE BOX, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8662

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRUZ DEYSI

Defendants

SOCAL JIB FOOD MANAGEMENT INC.

JACK IN THE BOX INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TROSHCHIY OLGA

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

6/3/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

5/18/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Complaint

5/18/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2024
  • Hearing05/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • Hearing11/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • Hearing11/01/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Deysi Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Deysi Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Deysi Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOCAL JIB FOOD MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where JACK IN THE BOX INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TROSHCHIY OLGA N.