This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/01/2022 at 02:55:06 (UTC).

DEVO BROWN, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 DEVO BROWN filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4631

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BROWN DEVO

BROWN REBECCA

MALIBU SOLSTICE

PROFIT SHARING RETIREMENT PLAN/SCHMITZ & ASSOCIATES INCORPORATED

SCHMITZ AND ASSOCIATES INCORPORATED

SCHMITZ DONALD W. JR.

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRIDGFORD ALLAN

Defendant Attorneys

FLIGOR CRAIG A.

FLIGOR CRAIG A

HUESTON JOHN CHARLES

RECK BELYNDA BRIDGELAND

HUESTON ESQ JOHN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL ALL ATTYS FOR STR...)

7/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL ALL ATTYS FOR STR...)

Unknown - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

7/19/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

Order - ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

6/3/2022: Order - ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Unknown - NOTICE RE: ADD-ON PETITION NOTICE OF SUBMISSION RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

6/10/2022: Unknown - NOTICE RE: ADD-ON PETITION NOTICE OF SUBMISSION RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONALS PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Answer - DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

6/2/2022: Answer - DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION)

5/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION) OF 05/18/2022

5/18/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION) OF 05/18/2022

Unknown - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

5/19/2022: Unknown - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

5/19/2022: Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

5/19/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: COURT'S ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION

5/25/2022: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: COURT'S ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/2/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/2/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

5/2/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Complaint

5/2/2022: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 10; Further Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 10; Further Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 10; Further Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel all attys for Str...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Order Re: Petition for Coordination of Add-On Case; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketNotice Of Submission Re: Southern California Edison Company And Edison International?s Petition To Coordinate Add-On Case; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketOrder (Re: Petition for Coordination of Add-on Case); Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Service Re: Southern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-on Case; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Craig A. Fligor in Support of Southern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-on Case; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketSouthern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-on Case; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham III, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Complex Designation)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Complex Designation) of 05/18/2022); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Devo Brown (Plaintiff); Rebecca Brown (Plaintiff); Donald W. Schmitz, Jr. (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Devo Brown (Plaintiff); Rebecca Brown (Plaintiff); Donald W. Schmitz, Jr. (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Devo Brown (Plaintiff); Rebecca Brown (Plaintiff); Donald W. Schmitz, Jr. (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Devo Brown (Plaintiff); Rebecca Brown (Plaintiff); Donald W. Schmitz, Jr. (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SCHMITZ & ASSOCIATES is a litigant

Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUESTON ESQ JOHN