This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/17/2023 at 07:26:57 (UTC).

DEVANCE HARRIS VS HP COMMUNICATIONS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/04/2023 DEVANCE HARRIS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against HP COMMUNICATIONS, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0107

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRIS DEVANCE

Defendants

AGUILAR ORLANDO

HP COMMUNICATIONS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RAMIREZ ESQ. APRIL

ALEXANDROFF ESQ. NICHOLAS

Defendant Attorney

TEINERT PAUL M.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/4/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/4/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/4/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/4/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/4/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/4/2023: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/4/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/4/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/11/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/1/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT ORLANDO AGUILAR TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

2/23/2023: Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT ORLANDO AGUILAR TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Answer

2/23/2023: Answer

Case Management Statement

4/18/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/18/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/4/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/4/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Order - TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

5/4/2023: Order - TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2024
  • Hearing12/04/2024 at 11:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2024
  • Hearing11/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketTrial Preparation Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketJury Trial (7 days) scheduled for 12/04/2024 at 11:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Devance Harris (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53 updated: Result Date to 05/04/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Hp Communications, Inc. (Defendant); Orlando Aguilar (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Devance Harris (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- April Ramirez, Esq. (Attorney): Last Name changed from Ramirez to Ramirez, Esq.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketAddress for April Ramirez, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Devance Harris (Plaintiff); As to: Hp Communications, Inc. (Defendant); Orlando Aguilar (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Devance Harris (Plaintiff); As to: Hp Communications, Inc. (Defendant); Orlando Aguilar (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less