This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/07/2023 at 12:18:39 (UTC).

DEVANCE HARRIS VS HP COMMUNICATIONS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/04/2023 DEVANCE HARRIS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against HP COMMUNICATIONS, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0107

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRIS DEVANCE

Defendants

AGUILAR ORLANDO

HP COMMUNICATIONS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALEXANDROFF ESQ. NICHOLAS

RAMIREZ ESQ. APRIL

Defendant Attorney

TEINERT PAUL M.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/4/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/4/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/4/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/4/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/4/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/4/2023: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/4/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/4/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/11/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/1/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT ORLANDO AGUILAR TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

2/23/2023: Answer - ANSWER OF DEFENDANT ORLANDO AGUILAR TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Answer

2/23/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2023
  • Hearing05/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Hp Communications, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Devance Harris (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketAnswer OF DEFENDANT ORLANDO AGUILAR TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; Filed by: Orlando Aguilar (Defendant); As to: Devance Harris (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Devance Harris (Plaintiff); As to: Hp Communications, Inc. (Defendant); Orlando Aguilar (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/09/2023; Service Cost: 56.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Devance Harris (Plaintiff); As to: Hp Communications, Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/09/2023; Service Cost: 96.60; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Devance Harris (Plaintiff); As to: Hp Communications, Inc. (Defendant); Orlando Aguilar (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Robert B. Broadbelt in Department 53 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- April Ramirez, Esq. (Attorney): Last Name changed from Ramirez to Ramirez, Esq.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketAddress for April Ramirez, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Devance Harris (Plaintiff); As to: Hp Communications, Inc. (Defendant); Orlando Aguilar (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Devance Harris (Plaintiff); As to: Hp Communications, Inc. (Defendant); Orlando Aguilar (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less