This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2022 at 07:59:04 (UTC).

DESTINY RAGO, ET AL. VS BEVERLY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/22/2021 DESTINY RAGO filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against BEVERLY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9034

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAGO DESTINY

RAGO DOMENICK

Defendants

BEVERLY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION DBA BEVERLY HOSPITAL

LEE M.D. STEPHEN

PATEL DEVANG J

STEPHEN Y. LEE M.D. INCORPORATED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAGEL BRUCE G

Defendant Attorneys

TROTTER MICHAEL

PLEISS LARRY T.

ROSA STEPHEN ALLEN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/22/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/12/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/12/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Mail

10/26/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/25/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

12/6/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL

12/6/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL

Answer

12/6/2021: Answer

Answer

12/1/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

11/30/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

11/30/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/29/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/17/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/18/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2024
  • Hearing10/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • Hearing04/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • Hearing04/07/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Destiny Rago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Devang J Patel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL); Filed by Devang J Patel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Devang J Patel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Stephen Lee M.D. (Defendant); Stephen Y. Lee M.D. Incorporated (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Beverly Community Hospital Association (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Beverly Community Hospital Association (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Destiny Rago (Plaintiff); Domenick Rago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Destiny Rago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Destiny Rago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Destiny Rago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Destiny Rago (Plaintiff); Domenick Rago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Destiny Rago (Plaintiff); Domenick Rago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Destiny Rago (Plaintiff); Domenick Rago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Destiny Rago (Plaintiff); Domenick Rago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Destiny Rago (Plaintiff); Domenick Rago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEVERLY HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAGEL, BRUCE G