This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/04/2022 at 16:47:09 (UTC).

DESIREE OJEDA VS TEALIUM, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/14/2022 DESIREE OJEDA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against TEALIUM, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0041

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OJEDA DESIREE

Defendant

TEALIUM INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAVANMARDI PEDRAM AMIR

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/14/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

9/14/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/14/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/14/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/14/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/14/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/27/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2023
  • Hearing01/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 39

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephen I. Goorvitch in Department 39 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Desiree Ojeda (Plaintiff); As to: Tealium, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Desiree Ojeda (Plaintiff); As to: Tealium, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Desiree Ojeda (Plaintiff); As to: Tealium, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAVANMARDI PETER A.