This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/26/2022 at 07:20:45 (UTC).

DESIREE LOWENBERG, AN INDIVIDUAL VS SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO., A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 DESIREE LOWENBERG, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0612

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DESIREE LOWENBERG AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendant

SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO. A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BABAIAN RAYMOND

Defendant Attorney

WALSH DENNIS JOHN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/2/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

6/22/2021: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/18/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

6/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

7/2/2021: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: REMOVAL TO DISTRICT COURT)

9/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: REMOVAL TO DISTRICT COURT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: REMOVAL TO DISTRICT COURT) OF 09/21/2021

9/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: REMOVAL TO DISTRICT COURT) OF 09/21/2021

Case Management Statement

9/15/2021: Case Management Statement

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 39; Case Management Conference (/Order to Show Cause Re Dismissal for Failure to Serve and Prosecute) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 39; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order: Removal to District Court)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order: Removal to District Court) of 09/21/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by DESIREE LOWENBERG, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO., a Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO., a Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by DESIREE LOWENBERG, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by DESIREE LOWENBERG, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DESIREE LOWENBERG, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DESIREE LOWENBERG, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHWEST AIRLINES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALSH DENNIS J. ESQ.