This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/19/2023 at 10:45:34 (UTC).

DESIRAY GONZALEZ VS JOSHUA ALLEN PFANNENSTIEL JONES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 DESIRAY GONZALEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSHUA ALLEN PFANNENSTIEL JONES,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7074

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ DESIRAY

Defendants

JONES REBECCA

PFANNENSTIEL JONES JOSHUA ALLEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MESAROS CHRISTOPHER P.

Defendant Attorney

SARKISSIAN PATRICK J.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/22/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

8/4/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

8/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/18/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

9/20/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/20/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

9/20/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

10/27/2022: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2024
  • Hearing07/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2023
  • Hearing12/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2023
  • Hearing12/06/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 26 - Hon. Mark E. Windham; Reason: Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Signed and Filed by: Desiray Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: Joshua Allen Pfannenstiel Jones (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 29 - Hon. Serena R. Murillo; Reason: Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 01/05/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 12/06/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 12/20/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Joshua Allen Pfannenstiel Jones (Defendant); As to: Desiray Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Joshua Allen Pfannenstiel Jones (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/05/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 07/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Desiray Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: Joshua Allen Pfannenstiel Jones (Defendant); Rebecca Jones (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Desiray Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: Joshua Allen Pfannenstiel Jones (Defendant); Rebecca Jones (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Desiray Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: Joshua Allen Pfannenstiel Jones (Defendant); Rebecca Jones (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less