This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/27/2019 at 01:48:36 (UTC).

DESIGN ESCROW INC VS LAURENCE I DUNN ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 DESIGN ESCROW INC filed an Other lawsuit against LAURENCE I DUNN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD E. RICO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8952

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD E. RICO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DESIGN ESCROW INC.

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

KELLER WILLIAMS REALTY

PASADENA MARKET CENTER INC.

DUNN LAURENCE I.

DOES 1 TO 25

PASADENA MARKET CENTER INC. DBA KELLER WILLIAMS REALTY

Not Classified By Court

TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

RELAW PC

FELTEN JENNIFER

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

KLIER-ERLICH RINAT

ALKANA EUGENE STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

5/17/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: DIPOSITION OF FUNDS HELD BY THE COURT AND ORDER THEREON

3/19/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: DIPOSITION OF FUNDS HELD BY THE COURT AND ORDER THEREON

Answer - Pasadena Market Center, Inc. dba Keller Williams Realty's Answer to Unverified Cross-Complaint of Laurence I. Dunn

12/20/2018: Answer - Pasadena Market Center, Inc. dba Keller Williams Realty's Answer to Unverified Cross-Complaint of Laurence I. Dunn

Case Management Statement

1/7/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/21/2018: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/30/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

10/29/2018: Answer

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

12/20/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service as t...)

12/14/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service as t...)

Cross-Complaint

11/26/2018: Cross-Complaint

Answer - Answer to Complaint in Interpleader

11/26/2018: Answer - Answer to Complaint in Interpleader

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/20/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Other - - Other - Amended Affidavit Of Due Diligence

11/2/2018: Other - - Other - Amended Affidavit Of Due Diligence

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

9/14/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

9/14/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

VERIFIED COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER

8/24/2018: VERIFIED COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

8/24/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

SUMMONS -

8/24/2018: SUMMONS -

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Laurence I. Dunn (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Pasadena Market Center, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (re: diposition of funds held by the court and order thereon); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Pasadena Market Center, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Pasadena Market Center, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketAffidavit ; Filed by Design Escrow, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Design Escrow, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Design Escrow, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF FUNDS IN INTERPLEADER AND REQUEST FOR FUNDS TO BE DEPOSITED IN INTEREST BEARING ACCOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PASADENA MARKET CENTER INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA KELLER WILLIAMS PASADENA is a litigant

Latest cases where TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION is a litigant

Latest cases where Keller Williams Realty, Inc. is a litigant