This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/27/2022 at 12:33:43 (UTC).

DERRICK FAR, ET AL. VS ASHOT ANTONYAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/10/2021 DERRICK FAR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ASHOT ANTONYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1366

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FAR DERRICK

KHAFAJIZADEH MARYAM

Defendants

ANTONYAN ASHOT

CARLIN MELANIE

MARTIROSYAN ARTAK

TORRES MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROCK CAMERON Y.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/10/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/10/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal

12/1/2021: Request for Dismissal

PI General Order

11/30/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

1/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 01/19/2022

1/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 01/19/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 01/19/2022

1/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 01/19/2022

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/19/2022

1/19/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/19/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2024
  • Hearing11/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • Hearing05/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • Hearing04/26/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Docketat 3:41 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Docketat 2:49 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order) of 01/19/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/19/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Derrick Far (Plaintiff); Maryam Khafajizadeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Derrick Far (Plaintiff); Maryam Khafajizadeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Derrick Far (Plaintiff); Maryam Khafajizadeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Derrick Far (Plaintiff); Maryam Khafajizadeh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROCK CAMERON Y