This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/24/2021 at 21:12:36 (UTC).

DEREK AND LYNETTE BROWN VS DUGALLY OBERFELD, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/23/2020 DEREK AND LYNETTE BROWN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DUGALLY OBERFELD, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HUEY P. COTTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0695

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HUEY P. COTTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROWN DEREK AND LYNETTE

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

DUGALLY OBERFELD INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WICR WATERPROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION INC.

UNDER J & J DRYWALL

ARCHITECTURAL INSTALLATION INC. DBA L&M INSTALLATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS L+M INSTALLATIONS

Cross Defendants

DEREK AND LYNETTE BROWN BOTH INDIVIDUALS AS TRUSTEES OF THE BROWN FAMILY TRUST

RAINBOWS PAINTING & CONSTRUCTION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WICR WATERPROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

L+M INSTALLATIONS A BUSINESS ASSOCIATION OF UNKNOWN FORM

PRECISION GLASS BEVELLING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

UNDER J&J DRYWALL A BUSINESS ASSOCIATION OF UNKNOWN FORM

MOES 1 TO 50

MOES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

ROES 1 THROUGH 20 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAY JERRY L.

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

FROST CHRISTOPHER

HENSTRIDGE ROBERT M.

SENET THEODORE L.

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

HENSTRIDGE ROBERT M.

SENET THEODORE L.

DANCE WILLIAM

BOGGS JOSIAH C.

WATKINS ESME MICHELLE

ADAMS CATHERINE MARIE

CANNON CATHERINE

 

Court Documents

Association of Attorney

11/12/2021: Association of Attorney

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY OF HANDLING COUNSEL

9/10/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY OF HANDLING COUNSEL

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

9/15/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Notice - NOTICE CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

9/24/2021: Notice - NOTICE CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

Order - MODIFIED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

7/27/2021: Order - MODIFIED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

7/22/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice - NOTICE NTC OF RULING RE TSC & PMSC

7/22/2021: Notice - NOTICE NTC OF RULING RE TSC & PMSC

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Cross-Complaint

6/17/2021: Cross-Complaint

Order - ORDER DRAFT [PROPOSED] CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

6/28/2021: Order - ORDER DRAFT [PROPOSED] CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Case Management Statement

6/8/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

6/9/2021: Case Management Statement

Request - REQUEST REQUEST FOR PRIOR PLEADINGS AND DISCOVERY

6/15/2021: Request - REQUEST REQUEST FOR PRIOR PLEADINGS AND DISCOVERY

Case Management Statement

6/16/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/16/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Request - REQUEST REQUEST FOR PRIOR PLEADINGS AND DISCOVERY

6/16/2021: Request - REQUEST REQUEST FOR PRIOR PLEADINGS AND DISCOVERY

Answer

6/17/2021: Answer

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • Hearing08/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • Hearing08/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by PRECISION GLASS BEVELLING INC., a California corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketNotice (change of handling attorney); Filed by WICR WATERPROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION, INC., a California corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Entry of Case Management Order); Filed by Derek and Lynette Brown (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY OF HANDLING COUNSEL); Filed by UNDER J & J DRYWALL (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketModified Case Management Order; Filed by Derek and Lynette Brown (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNotice (Ntc of Ruling re TSC & PMSC); Filed by Derek and Lynette Brown (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by UNDER J & J DRYWALL (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Dugally Oberfeld, Inc., a California corporation (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Derek and Lynette Brown (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Dugally Oberfeld, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Dugally Oberfeld, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Derek and Lynette Brown (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Derek and Lynette Brown (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Derek and Lynette Brown (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Derek and Lynette Brown (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RAINBOWS PAINTING & CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Dugally Oberfeld, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ARCHITECTURAL INSTALLATION INC. DBA L&M INSTALLATION is a litigant

Latest cases where WICR WATERPROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant