This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2019 at 03:32:41 (UTC).

DEON MORRIS VS CELIA ANN FISHER ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/15/2017 DEON MORRIS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CELIA ANN FISHER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3454

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MORRIS DEONBY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN

Defendants and Respondents

FISHER CELIA ANN

INVESTMENT LLC

DOES 1 TO 100

94TH STREET INVESTMENTS. LLC

Guardian Ad Litem

WILLIAM EBONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BARRY CLIFFORD N. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

POULADIAN VANESSA

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

2/21/2018: SUMMONS

PETITION TO APPROVE: COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM- MINOR

4/19/2018: PETITION TO APPROVE: COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM- MINOR

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

4/30/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT B94TH STREET INVESTMENT, LLC

5/24/2018: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT B94TH STREET INVESTMENT, LLC

Minute Order

6/4/2018: Minute Order

ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT

6/5/2018: ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT

ORDER RE: PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF MINOR; ETC

6/5/2018: ORDER RE: PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF MINOR; ETC

ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY

6/5/2018: ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM PLAINTIFF, DEON MORRIS, BY AND THROUGH GUARDIAN AD LITEM EBONY WILLIAM TO DEFENDANT'S FORM INTERROGATORWS, SET NO. ONE AND REQ

8/15/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM PLAINTIFF, DEON MORRIS, BY AND THROUGH GUARDIAN AD LITEM EBONY WILLIAM TO DEFENDANT'S FORM INTERROGATORWS, SET NO. ONE AND REQ

DEFENDANT 94TH STREET INVESTMENTS, LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DEEM ADMISSIONS ADMITTED AND MOTION FOR REASONABLE SANCTIONS AND ATTORNEY FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,170.OO AGAINST PLAINTIFF DEON

8/15/2018: DEFENDANT 94TH STREET INVESTMENTS, LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DEEM ADMISSIONS ADMITTED AND MOTION FOR REASONABLE SANCTIONS AND ATTORNEY FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,170.OO AGAINST PLAINTIFF DEON

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM PLAINTIFF, DEON MORRIS, BY AND THROUGH GUARDIAN AD LITEM EBONY WILLIAM TO DEFENDANT'S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET NO. ONE AND

8/15/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM PLAINTIFF, DEON MORRIS, BY AND THROUGH GUARDIAN AD LITEM EBONY WILLIAM TO DEFENDANT'S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET NO. ONE AND

DEFENDANT, 94TH STREET INVESTMENTS, LLC'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

9/17/2018: DEFENDANT, 94TH STREET INVESTMENTS, LLC'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

Notice

1/18/2019: Notice

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/6/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

1/11/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE?CIVIL

12/21/2017: PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE?CIVIL

FIRST AMENDED - PERSONAL DAMEGE- PROPRTY DAMAGE

12/22/2017: FIRST AMENDED - PERSONAL DAMEGE- PROPRTY DAMAGE

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

11/15/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by MORRIS, DEONBY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Clifford N. Barry, ESQ. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Notice (Notice of Association of Counsel); Filed by MORRIS, DEONBY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 7; Hearing on Motion to Compel ((Off Calendar)) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-09-24 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Reply/Response; Filed by 94TH STREET INVESTMENTS. LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DEFENDANT, 94TH STREET INVESTMENTS, LLC'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM PLAINTIFF, DEON MORRIS, BY AND THROUGH GUARDIAN AD LITEM EBONY WILLIAM TO DEFENDANT'S FORM INTERROGATORWS, SET NO. ONE AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $800.00 UN

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2018
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by MORRIS, DEONBY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • FIRST AMENDED - PERSONAL DAMEGE- PROPRTY DAMAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL - EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by MORRIS, DEONBY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC683454    Hearing Date: February 27, 2020    Dept: 27

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: SECOND AMENDED PETITION TO APPROVE MINOR’S COMPROMISE

Claimant Deon Morris (“Claimant”), a minor, by and through his Guardian Ad Litem, Debora C. Nasarro (“Petitioner”), has agreed to settle his claims against Defendant 94th Street Investment, LLC in exchange for $1,000,000.00. If approved, $154,900.06 or less will be used for medical expenses, $333,333.33 will be used for attorney’s fees, and $10,237.81 will be used for non-medical expenses, leaving a balance of $501,529.43 for Claimant to be invested in a single-premium deferred annuity, subject to withdrawal only upon the authorization of the Court.

Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim. (Probate Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; Code Civ. Proc. § 372.) The Court has reviewed the proposed settlement and finds that it is fair and reasonable. Further, the requested attorney’s fees, which amounts to approximately 33% of the total settlement, is fair and reasonable.

The Petitioner checked Item 13b(4)(d) stating she is entitled to a reduction of the Medi-Cal lien under Welfare and Institutions Code section 14124.76, but the Petition does not state the amount of the lien in dispute or check Items 13b(4)(d)(i) or 13b(4)(d)(ii). If the check in Item 13b(4)(d) is incorrect, Petitioner should be prepared to state so at the hearing. If the check is correct, Petitioner is to file an amended Petitioner completing Item 13b(4)(d).

Subject to clarification about Item 13b(4)(d), the unopposed Petition to approve minor’s compromise is GRANTED.

Per California Rules of Court, Rule 7.952, Petitioner and Claimant must appear at the February 27, 2019 hearing, unless the Court finds good cause to excuse their appearance. The Court finds that Claimant’s appearance is not necessary, but will require Petitioner to appear.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.

Case Number: BC683454    Hearing Date: December 19, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: PETITION TO APPROVE MINOR’S COMPROMISE

Claimant Deon Morris (“Claimant”), a minor, by and through his Guardian Ad Litem, Debora C. Nasarro (“Petitioner”), has agreed to settle his claims against Defendant 94th Street Investment, LLC in exchange for $1,000,000.00. If approved, “$198,707.44 or less” will be used for medical expenses, $333,333.33 will be used for attorney’s fees, and $11,588.95 will be used for non-medical expenses, leaving a balance of $458,370.28 for Claimant to be deposited into a blocked account, subject to withdrawal only upon authorization of the court

Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim. (Probate Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; Code Civ. Proc. § 372.) The Court has reviewed the proposed settlement and finds that it is fair and reasonable. Further, the requested attorney’s fees, which amounts to approximately 33% of the total settlement, is fair and reasonable. However, the Petition does not attach a copy of the notice to the State Director of Health Care Services as required by Welfare and Institutions Code section 14124.73. (See Item 13b(4).) There is no evidence that $825,454.00 in medical expenses was incurred and that all but $198,707.44 has been paid. Nor is there any evidence that Medi-Cal has paid and has a lien of “$198,707.44 or less.” The specific amount of the lien must be stated with backup evidence. There is also no evidence of the costs incurred by counsel to justify $11,588.95 in costs.

The unopposed Petition to approve minor’s compromise is DENIED without prejudice for Petitioner to provide the information and give the notice described above.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.