This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/25/2023 at 04:17:42 (UTC).

DENNIS GUTIERREZ VS RITE AID CORPORATION,, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2022 DENNIS GUTIERREZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against RITE AID CORPORATION,,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KENNETH R. FREEMAN, MAREN NELSON and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5365

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

MAREN NELSON

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUTIERREZ DENNIS

Defendants

RITE AID CORPORATION

THRIFTY PAYLESS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JONATHAN DANIEL S

MONESI TRISHA K.

PIKE BEVIN ALLEN

Defendant Attorneys

DAMRON-HSIAO KYMBERLEIGH A

BRIGGS GLENN L.

MOHAMMADI SARAH R.

STRINGFELLOW STANLEY G

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re. Notice of Related Case;)

10/17/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re. Notice of Related Case;)

Notice (name extension) Notice Notice of Order Assigning Coordiation Motion Judge

9/21/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice Notice of Order Assigning Coordiation Motion Judge

Notice (name extension) Notice of Order Assigning a Coordination Motion Judge in a Coordination Proceeding

8/29/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice of Order Assigning a Coordination Motion Judge in a Coordination Proceeding

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Proof of Service of Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination and Motion to Stay

7/28/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Proof of Service of Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination and Motion to Stay

Notice (name extension) Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination of Actions and Motion to Stay

7/28/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination of Actions and Motion to Stay

Notice (name extension) Notice of Further Case Management Conference

7/3/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice of Further Case Management Conference

Minute Order Minute Order (Initial Status Conference)

6/27/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Initial Status Conference)

Initial Status Conference Report Initial Status Conference Report

6/20/2023: Initial Status Conference Report Initial Status Conference Report

Initial Status Conference Order

4/18/2023: Initial Status Conference Order

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Initial Status Conference) of 04/18/2023, Initial Status Conference Order

4/18/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Initial Status Conference) of 04/18/2023, Initial Status Conference Order

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order re: Initial Status Conference)

4/18/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order re: Initial Status Conference)

Notice (name extension) Notice of Minute Order

4/12/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice of Minute Order

Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Defendants Thrifty Payless, Inc., and Rite Aid Corporation

4/12/2023: Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Defendants Thrifty Payless, Inc., and Rite Aid Corporation

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer (Cod...) of 04/06/2023

4/6/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer (Cod...) of 04/06/2023

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

4/6/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer (Cod...)

4/6/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer (Cod...)

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re. Case Assignment;) of 04/06/2023

4/6/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re. Case Assignment;) of 04/06/2023

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re. Case Assignment;)

4/6/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re. Case Assignment;)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/28/2024

Hearing05/28/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 14 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 05/28/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

DocketCase numbers 20STCV07120, 23STCV03824, 23STCV05365 are related; case number 20STCV07120 is the lead case.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 14 - Hon. Kenneth R. Freeman

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re. Notice of Related Case;)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 10/27/2023 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 17 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 10/17/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

DocketNotice Notice of Order Assigning Coordiation Motion Judge; Filed by: Rite Aid Corporation, (Defendant); Thrifty Payless, (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

DocketNotice of Order Assigning a Coordination Motion Judge in a Coordination Proceeding; Filed by: Rite Aid Corporation, (Defendant); Thrifty Payless, (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023

DocketNotice of Submission of Petition for Coordination of Actions and Motion to Stay; Filed by: Rite Aid Corporation, (Defendant); Thrifty Payless, (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023

DocketProof of Service of Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination and Motion to Stay; Filed by: Rite Aid Corporation, (Defendant); Thrifty Payless, (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
45 More Docket Entries
03/10/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2023

DocketUpdated -- Register of Actions: As To Parties:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Dennis Gutierrez (Plaintiff); As to: Rite Aid Corporation, (Defendant); Service Date: 07/12/2022; Service Cost: 91.19; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Filed by: Dennis Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2023

DocketCertificate of Assignment; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2023

DocketNotice of Trail Setting Conference and Notice of Case Assignment; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2023

DocketInitial Case Management Conference Order; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2022

DocketUpdated -- Civil Case Cover Sheet: Status Date changed from 03/10/2023 to 06/01/2022 ; As To Parties:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2022

DocketUpdated -- Complaint: Status Date changed from 03/10/2023 to 06/01/2022 ; As To Parties changed from Rite Aid Corporation, (Defendant), Thrifty Payless, (Defendant) to Rite Aid Corporation, (Defendant), Thrifty Payless, (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2022

DocketUpdated -- Register of Actions: Status Date changed from 03/10/2023 to 06/01/2022 ; Exact Name: Register of Actions ; As To Parties:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less