This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/08/2021 at 09:42:17 (UTC).

DENNIS GARR VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/07/2020 DENNIS GARR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES C. LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5046

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHARLES C. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARR DENNIS

Defendants

LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT A PUBLIC ENTITY

FRAIJO MATTHEW MARCUS

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VILLANEDA ALBERT A.

Defendant Attorney

MOON JENNIFER JULIET

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/3/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/8/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

6/18/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Answer

5/19/2020: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/23/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

4/13/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

3/17/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/17/2020: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

2/19/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

2/19/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/7/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/7/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/7/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/7/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/7/2020: Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2023
  • Hearing02/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • Hearing01/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • Hearing12/21/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by County of Los Angeles, a public entity (Defendant); Los Angeles County Sheriff's Department, a public entity (Defendant); Matthew Marcus Fraijo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Dennis Garr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by County of Los Angeles, a public entity (Defendant); Los Angeles County Sheriff's Department, a public entity (Defendant); Matthew Marcus Fraijo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Matthew Marcus Fraijo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Dennis Garr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by County of Los Angeles, a public entity (Defendant); Los Angeles County Sheriff's Department, a public entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Dennis Garr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Dennis Garr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dennis Garr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Dennis Garr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dennis Garr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dennis Garr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VILLANEDA ALBERT ANTHONY