This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/21/2022 at 08:15:10 (UTC).

DENNIS FIRETHUNDER, AN INDIVIDUAL VS CHRISTY VENTURA, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/02/2020 DENNIS FIRETHUNDER, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHRISTY VENTURA, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4968

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRETHUNDER AN INDIVIDUAL DENNIS

Defendants

CITY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY A PUBLIC ENTITY

FIRST TRANSIT INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

BECKETT AN INDIVIDUAL KEVYONA DENISE

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

VENTURA AN INDIVIDUAL CHRISTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AZIZI DANIEL

Defendant Attorneys

MATHEVOSIAN RINA M

CULLINS DOUGLAS DRAKE

KOHRS CONRAD

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Request for Dismissal

7/21/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

4/15/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Refund / Order

12/28/2020: Request for Refund / Order

Answer

1/5/2021: Answer

Request for Dismissal

12/28/2020: Request for Dismissal

Answer

12/22/2020: Answer

Answer

12/23/2020: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

12/23/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/9/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/10/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/4/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/4/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/5/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/6/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

8/6/2020: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

7/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2022
  • Hearing07/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • Hearing07/06/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by DENNIS FIRETHUNDER, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by DENNIS FIRETHUNDER, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CHRISTY VENTURA, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order; Filed by KEVYONA DENISE BECKETT, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant); LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by DENNIS FIRETHUNDER, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by DENNIS FIRETHUNDER, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by DENNIS FIRETHUNDER, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CHRISTY VENTURA, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by CHRISTY VENTURA, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DENNIS FIRETHUNDER, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by DENNIS FIRETHUNDER, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DENNIS FIRETHUNDER, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST TRANSIT is a litigant