This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2022 at 20:25:02 (UTC).

DENNIS CASTILLO, ET AL. VS KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/13/2022 DENNIS CASTILLO filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2470

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALVAREZ BRENDA

CASTILLO CARLOS

Defendants

DOE 1 DOE 2 DOE 3 DOE 4 DOE 5 DOE 6 DOES 7 THROUGH 50

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC.

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOVACK BARRY BERNARD

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/13/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

4/13/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/13/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/13/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/13/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/13/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

4/13/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/13/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/13/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

4/13/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/14/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DENNIS

4/14/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DENNIS

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2025
  • Hearing04/09/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2023
  • Hearing10/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2023
  • Hearing09/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Dennis); Filed by Dennis Castillo (Plaintiff); Carlos Castillo (Plaintiff); Brenda Alvarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Dennis Castillo (Plaintiff); Carlos Castillo (Plaintiff); Brenda Alvarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dennis Castillo (Plaintiff); Carlos Castillo (Plaintiff); Brenda Alvarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dennis Castillo (Plaintiff); Carlos Castillo (Plaintiff); Brenda Alvarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dennis Castillo (Plaintiff); Carlos Castillo (Plaintiff); Brenda Alvarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NOVACK BARRY BERNARD