This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2021 at 15:15:11 (UTC).

DENNIS ADKINS VS ALBERTSON'S INC.

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 DENNIS ADKINS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ALBERTSON'S INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9866

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADKINS DENNIS

Defendant

ALBERTSON'S INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YEAGER KENNETH

Defendant Attorney

HERZOG JONATHON

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/10/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

6/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

6/28/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/28/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/26/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2024
  • Hearing05/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • Hearing11/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • Hearing11/09/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Albertson's Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Albertson's Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Dennis Adkins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dennis Adkins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Dennis Adkins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dennis Adkins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALBERTSON'S COMPANIES LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERZOG JONATHON