Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/22/2021 at 08:11:51 (UTC).

DENIZ SILVER VS MATTHEW DEBOER

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 DENIZ SILVER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MATTHEW DEBOER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6476

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SILVER DENIZ

Defendant

DEBOER MATTHEW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANUKYAN AREN

Defendant Attorney

ADEM STEPHANIE N.

 

Court Documents

Answer

12/4/2020: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/4/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

12/8/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

10/6/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

10/6/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/23/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/23/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/23/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/23/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2023
  • Hearing09/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • Hearing03/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • Hearing03/09/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Matthew Deboer (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Matthew Deboer (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Matthew Deboer (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Deniz Silver (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Deniz Silver (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Deniz Silver (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADEM STEPHANIE N.