Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2021 at 15:56:43 (UTC).

DENISSE VELASQUEZ VS FCA US LLC

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 DENISSE VELASQUEZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0305

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VELASQUEZ DENISSE

Defendant

FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

HANSON ERIN

Other Attorneys

BASOLA JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

5/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Answer

4/26/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

3/30/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/4/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/5/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/5/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • Hearing08/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by FCA US LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Denisse Velasquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Denisse Velasquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Denisse Velasquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Denisse Velasquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BASOLA JENNIFER