This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2021 at 10:59:31 (UTC).

DENISSE LUQUIN, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DECEDENT ALFREDO LUQUIN, SR, ET AL. VS SMART & FINAL STORES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/18/2021 DENISSE LUQUIN, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DECEDENT ALFREDO LUQUIN, SR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SMART FINAL STORES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8665

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OSCAR LUQUIN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DECEDENT ALFREDO LUQUIN SR

DENISSE LUQUIN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DECEDENT ALFREDO LUQUIN SR

ALFREDO LUQUIN JR. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DECEDENT ALFREDO LUQUIN SR

Defendants

PRECIADO AN INDIVIDUAL EDDIE

SMART & FINAL STORES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SMART & FINAL LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAHINE HUSSEIN

Defendant Attorney

CHERMELA JASON R.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/6/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

7/6/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

7/6/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

6/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/4/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/18/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2024
  • Hearing05/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • Hearing11/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • Hearing11/01/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by SMART & FINAL STORES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Defendant); SMART & FINAL, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Defendant); EDDIE PRECIADO, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SMART & FINAL STORES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Defendant); SMART & FINAL, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Defendant); EDDIE PRECIADO, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by SMART & FINAL STORES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Defendant); SMART & FINAL, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Defendant); EDDIE PRECIADO, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by DENISSE LUQUIN, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DECEDENT ALFREDO LUQUIN, SR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by DENISSE LUQUIN, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DECEDENT ALFREDO LUQUIN, SR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by DENISSE LUQUIN, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DECEDENT ALFREDO LUQUIN, SR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DENISSE LUQUIN, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DECEDENT ALFREDO LUQUIN, SR (Plaintiff); OSCAR LUQUIN, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DECEDENT ALFREDO LUQUIN, SR, (Plaintiff); ALFREDO LUQUIN, JR., INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DENISSE LUQUIN, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DECEDENT ALFREDO LUQUIN, SR (Plaintiff); OSCAR LUQUIN, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DECEDENT ALFREDO LUQUIN, SR, (Plaintiff); ALFREDO LUQUIN, JR., INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by DENISSE LUQUIN, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DECEDENT ALFREDO LUQUIN, SR (Plaintiff); OSCAR LUQUIN, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO DECEDENT ALFREDO LUQUIN, SR, (Plaintiff); ALFREDO LUQUIN, JR., INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-I

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SMART & FINAL STORES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SMART & FINAL STORES LLC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chahine, Hussein A