Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/13/2021 at 00:58:29 (UTC).

DENISE MCDERMOTT VS. DAVID T. MACKLIN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/18/2018 DENISE MCDERMOTT filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DAVID T MACKLIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT B. BROADBELT, RAMONA G. SEE, STUART M. RICE and DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3018

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

RAMONA G. SEE

STUART M. RICE

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCDERMOTT DENISE

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

I WEAR LLC

PARKS SHULOVE RESMIA

MACKLIN ENTERPRISES INC.

PARKS SHULOVE RESHA

27REASONS FOUNDATION INC.

GLORY DAYS 4 ON 4 LLC

HILL SHULOVE R.

WYFY ENTERTAINMENT LLC

DOES 1-50

MACKLIN DAVID T.

SYMPOSIUM SPORTS MANAEMENT LLC

PARKS SHULOVE

PARKS SHULOVE M.

MACKLIN OWNER WYFY ENTERTAINMENT LLC AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DAVID T.

I WEAR LLC AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MACKLIN ENTERPRISES INC. VIRGINIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN J. KENSIK

KENSIK KEVIN JOHN

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Mail

11/20/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES AND DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO DEFENDANT'S DEPOSITION SUBPOENA, REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

10/21/2020: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES AND DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO DEFENDANT'S DEPOSITION SUBPOENA, REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT (CCP 473.5))

8/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT (CCP 473.5))

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT (CCP 473.5)) OF 08/09/2019

8/9/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT (CCP 473.5)) OF 08/09/2019

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DENISE MCDERMOTT IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE

7/24/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DENISE MCDERMOTT IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARIO BERTUCELLI REGARDING MULTIPLE SERVICES ON DAVID T. MACKLIN

7/24/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARIO BERTUCELLI REGARDING MULTIPLE SERVICES ON DAVID T. MACKLIN

Request for Dismissal

12/28/2018: Request for Dismissal

Declaration - Declaration Of Mario E. Bertuccelli Re Amended Proof Of Service

12/6/2018: Declaration - Declaration Of Mario E. Bertuccelli Re Amended Proof Of Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof Of Service Of Summons

12/10/2018: Proof of Personal Service - Proof Of Service Of Summons

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/21/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Judgment - Judgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 12/28/2018 entered for Plaintiff DENISE MCDERMOTT against Defendant David T. Macklin.

12/28/2018: Judgment - Judgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 12/28/2018 entered for Plaintiff DENISE MCDERMOTT against Defendant David T. Macklin.

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

11/15/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

12/19/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/19/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference;)

12/10/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference;)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040))

11/27/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040))

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice -

8/20/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice -

Ex Parte Application - NOTICE

7/18/2018: Ex Parte Application - NOTICE

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • Hearing04/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Deposition Subpoena for Non Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel Deposition Subpoena for Non Party) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by DENISE MCDERMOTT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by DENISE MCDERMOTT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketMotion to Compel (Responses and Documents Responsive to Defendant's Deposition Subpoena, Request for Monetary Sanctions); Filed by DENISE MCDERMOTT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Service; Filed by David T. Macklin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5)) of 08/09/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by DENISE MCDERMOTT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Ex-Parte Proceedings (Exparte proceeding; Motion Denied) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketEx-Parte Application; Filed by DENISE MCDERMOTT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-07-18 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketMinute Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by DENISE MCDERMOTT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by DENISE MCDERMOTT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DENISE MCDERMOTT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketEx Parte Application NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by DENISE MCDERMOTT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KENSIK KEVIN JOHN