This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/31/2020 at 02:41:44 (UTC).

DENISE MARIE CAGLE VS CALIBER HOLDINGS CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/08/2019 DENISE MARIE CAGLE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CALIBER HOLDINGS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4570

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAGLE DENISE MARIE

Los Angeles, CA 90056

Defendant

CALIBER HOLDINGS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOHNSON WILL L.

Attorney at WILL JOHNSON LAW OFFICES

638 E. Colorado Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 91101

JOHNSON WILLIE DAN

Defendant Attorney

SETCHELL JOHN LUKE

 

Court Documents

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL

10/28/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)

10/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)

Answer

7/18/2019: Answer

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

4/6/2020: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF MOTION PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY OR...)

4/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF MOTION PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY OR...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF MOTION PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY OR...)]

4/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF MOTION PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY OR...)]

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER TO MINUTE ORDER DATED 4/20/20;) OF 05/04/2020

5/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER TO MINUTE ORDER DATED 4/20/20;) OF 05/04/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER TO MINUTE ORDER DATED 4/20/20;)

5/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER TO MINUTE ORDER DATED 4/20/20;)

Minute Order - (AMENDED)

5/4/2020: Minute Order - (AMENDED)

Proof of Personal Service

3/1/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Other - - Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

2/14/2019: Other - - Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

2/14/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

Complaint

2/8/2019: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/8/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/8/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/13/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2022
  • Hearing05/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • Hearing05/03/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • Hearing02/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketOpposition (Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel); Filed by CALIBER HOLDINGS CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Continuance of Motion Pursuant to Emergency Or...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion; Filed by DENISE MARIE CAGLE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CALIBER HOLDINGS CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by DENISE MARIE CAGLE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketStanding Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by DENISE MARIE CAGLE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DENISE MARIE CAGLE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DENISE MARIE CAGLE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STCV04570    Hearing Date: October 29, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

DENISE MARIE CAGLE,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

CALIBER HOLDINGS CORPORATION, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: 19STCV04570

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT’S MOTIONS TO COMPEL

Dept. 31

1:30 p.m.

October 29, 2020

Plaintiff propounded form interrogatories, set one, on Defendant on 7/25/19. To date, Defendant has not served responses. Plaintiff therefore seeks an order compelling Defendant to respond, without objections, to the outstanding discovery and to pay sanctions.

Plaintiff’s motion is unopposed and granted. Defendant is ordered to serve verified responses to form interrogatories, set one, without objections, within ten days. (CCP § 2030.290(a),(b).)

Sanctions are mandatory. (CCP § 2030.290(c).) Plaintiff seeks sanctions in the amount of $1,222.50. The court awards Plaintiff one hour for preparing the form motion to compel and one hour to appear at the hearing all at the reasonable rate $200 per hour, for a total of $400 in attorney’s fees. Further, Plaintiff is awarded the $60 motion filing fee as costs.

Plaintiff seeks sanctions against Defendant and Defendant’s counsel attorney of record. Plaintiff does not describe any conduct warranting sanctions against Defendant directly. Sanctions are imposed against Defendant’s attorney of record. Defendant’s counsel is ordered to pay sanctions to Plaintiff, by and through counsel of record, in the total amount of $460.00, within twenty days.

Plaintiff is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.orgIf the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear remotely.

 

Dated this 29th day of October, 2020

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIBER HOLDINGS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHNSON WILL L.