This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2021 at 15:54:28 (UTC).

DENISE IRENE FLORES VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 DENISE IRENE FLORES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2277

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORES DENISE IRENE

Defendants

DESANTOS ANTONIO

FARRELL DAMIAN ROBERT

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURNS NIGEL JOHN

Defendant Attorney

THOMAS TUONG VI

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/1/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

5/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

4/16/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

4/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Answer

8/17/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2024
  • Hearing03/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • Hearing09/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • Hearing09/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Denise Irene Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Denise Irene Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Denise Irene Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Denise Irene Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS TUONG VI