This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/15/2021 at 03:50:41 (UTC).

DENISE BERNAL VS LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/07/2021 DENISE BERNAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0586

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BERNAL DENISE

Defendants

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

HAZELTINE AVENUE ELEMENTARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUFOUR MICHAEL R.

Defendant Attorney

MORENO JEANNIE M.

 

Court Documents

Request - REQUEST DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

2/10/2021: Request - REQUEST DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Answer

2/10/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

2/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

2/4/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/11/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/7/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2024
  • Hearing01/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • Hearing07/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • Hearing06/23/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketRequest (Demand for Jury Trial); Filed by LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Denise Bernal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Denise Bernal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Denise Bernal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Denise Bernal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Denise Bernal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORENO JEANNIE MARGARET