This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 20:34:33 (UTC).

DENIS PARISEAU ET AL VS AZADEH TADAYON ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/24/2017 DENIS PARISEAU filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against AZADEH TADAYON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIZABETH R. FEFFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2679

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIZABETH R. FEFFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Cross Defendants

PARISEAU DENIS

IBAY MANNY

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1 TO 20

TADAYON AZADEH

SHAHIN KOROSH

SHAHIN KEVIN KOROSH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

TREYSTMAN ELEONORA

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

FISCHBACH JOSEPH S. ESQ.

FISCHBACH JOSEPH STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

8/28/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Petition to Vacate or Alter Arbitration Award (CCP 1285 - 1287.6)

9/30/2019: Petition to Vacate or Alter Arbitration Award (CCP 1285 - 1287.6)

Status Report

10/7/2019: Status Report

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION OF FISCHBACH & FISCHBACH FOR AN ORDER TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS AND CROSS-COMPLAINANTS AZADEH TADAYON AND KEVIN KOROSH

10/31/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION OF FISCHBACH & FISCHBACH FOR AN ORDER TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS AND CROSS-COMPLAINANTS AZADEH TADAYON AND KEVIN KOROSH

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD

12/5/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/20/2020

3/20/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/20/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

NOTICE OF RULING

1/24/2018: NOTICE OF RULING

Minute Order -

7/23/2018: Minute Order -

Case Management Statement

12/7/2018: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - Minute Order (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)

12/11/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)

Notice of Ruling

12/14/2018: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/12/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/19/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

STIPULATION REGARDING ARBITRATION AND STAY

12/12/2017: STIPULATION REGARDING ARBITRATION AND STAY

SUMMONS -

5/24/2017: SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/2/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

6/7/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2020
  • Hearing09/10/2020 at 09:30 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • Hearing08/28/2020 at 09:00 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • Hearing06/02/2020 at 09:00 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • Hearing06/02/2020 at 08:45 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • Docketat 1:59 PM in Department 39; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/20/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketMotion to Deem RFA's Admitted; Filed by Denis Pariseau (Plaintiff); Manny Ibay (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 39; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 39; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
94 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION PENDING FOR: 1) PARTITION OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1) PARTITION OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC662679    Hearing Date: November 20, 2019    Dept: 39

Denis Pariseau, et al. v. Azadeh Tadayon, et al., BC662679

Motions to be Relieved as Counsel by Joseph S. Fischbach, Counsel for Defendants Azadeh Tadayon and Kevin Korosh Shahin, counsel for Defendants: GRANT

Moving counsel have demonstrated compliance with the requirements of California Rules of Court, rule 3.1362.

Moving counsel are to submit an up-to-date MC-053 order.