This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2021 at 07:47:44 (UTC).

DENA ROCHELLE BROOKS VS CITY OF CARSON

Case Summary

On 02/27/2019 DENA ROCHELLE BROOKS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF CARSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are EDWARD B. MORETON and KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6859

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

EDWARD B. MORETON

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROOKS DENA ROCHELLE

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CITY OF CARSON

JOE'S SWEEPING INC.

NORMAN JUDITH

NORMAN JUDITH A.

JOE'S SWEEPING INC. ROE 1 ESA ROE 1

WEST COAST ARBORISTS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEUGELMANS JACQUES

Defendant Attorney

FRIEMAN DAVIDA M.

Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

DWYER NICHOLAS P.

BELOFSKY DAVID ARTHUR

Cross Defendant Attorney

MAHLSTEDT JOY L

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT

7/12/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT

Request for Judicial Notice

6/4/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Response - RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT

6/4/2021: Response - RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NICHOLAS P. DWYER

6/4/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NICHOLAS P. DWYER

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

6/4/2021: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Objection - OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS

6/4/2021: Objection - OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JACQUES BEUGELMANS RE TRANSCRIPT OF DEPOSITION OF ALBERTO BARRERAS

6/10/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JACQUES BEUGELMANS RE TRANSCRIPT OF DEPOSITION OF ALBERTO BARRERAS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OR IN THE ALTERNAT...)

6/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OR IN THE ALTERNAT...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OR IN THE ALTERNAT...) OF 06/10/2021

6/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OR IN THE ALTERNAT...) OF 06/10/2021

Notice of Ruling

6/16/2021: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/30/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Objection - OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MSJ

6/2/2021: Objection - OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MSJ

Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO JOE'S SWEEPING, INC.S MSJ

6/2/2021: Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO JOE'S SWEEPING, INC.S MSJ

Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS AND REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS

6/2/2021: Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS AND REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS

Response - RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUPPORTING CITY OF CARSONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

6/4/2021: Response - RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUPPORTING CITY OF CARSONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

5/25/2021: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Objection - OBJECTION TO EVIDENCE

5/25/2021: Objection - OBJECTION TO EVIDENCE

Request for Judicial Notice

5/25/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

89 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • Hearing02/14/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department A at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • Hearing02/07/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department A at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Joe's Sweeping, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department A, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (and or in the alternative summary adjudication (Joe Sweeping Inc.'s)) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department A, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication ((Judith A. Norman)) - Held - Motion Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department A, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (and or in the alternative summary adjudication (City of Carson)) - Held - Motion Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment and or in the alternat...) of 06/10/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment and or in the alternat...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Jacques Beugelmans re Transcript of Deposition of Alberto Barreras); Filed by Dena Rochelle Brooks (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
99 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Dena Rochelle Brooks (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint 1st; Filed by Dena Rochelle Brooks (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint (First); Filed by Dena Rochelle Brooks (Plaintiff); Dena Rochelle Brooks (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Dena Rochelle Brooks (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketStanding Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dena Rochelle Brooks (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Dena Rochelle Brooks (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dena Rochelle Brooks (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JOE'S SWEEPING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF CARSON A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where WEST COAST ARBORISTS INC. is a litigant