This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2019 at 02:49:36 (UTC).

DEMETRIO VIZCARRA MENDOZA ET AL VS LARRY GOERZEN ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/06/2017 DEMETRIO VIZCARRA MENDOZA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LARRY GOERZEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4875

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ESPINOZA MARTHA

MENDOZA DEMETRIO VIZCARRA

Defendants and Respondents

PROCTOR JOSIE

GOERZEN AMMIE

GOERZEN LARRY

DOES 1 TO 100

CARROWAY HARRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

UPTON JOHN H. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Application

2/14/2019: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

2/14/2019: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for an order to continue the current trial date and discovery cutoff) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (for an order to continue the current trial date and discovery cutoff); Filed by DEMETRIO VIZCARRA MENDOZA (Plaintiff); MARTHA ESPINOZA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an order to continue the ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by DEMETRIO VIZCARRA MENDOZA (Plaintiff); MARTHA ESPINOZA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC674875    Hearing Date: January 22, 2020    Dept: 27

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Morey & Upton, LLP seeks to be relieved as counsel of record for plaintiff Martha Espinoza. Counsel states that there has been a complete breakdown of the attorney-client relationship and all of its attempts to contact Plaintiff have been unsuccessful. Absent a showing of resulting prejudice, an attorney’s request for withdrawal should be granted. (People v. Prince (1968) 268 Cal.App.2d 398, 406.) Counsel’s Motion complies with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1362. The Court notes that trial in this matter is currently set for June 5, 2020 and no prejudice will result from granting this motion. Accordingly, this unopposed motion to be relieved is GRANTED and effective upon filing a proof of service showing service of the order on Plaintiff and all parties who have appeared.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.