This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2021 at 03:14:16 (UTC).

DEMETRIA MOLINA CARRANZA,, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JENIFER CARRANZA MOLINA, ET AL. VS FELIX J. SALDANA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 DEMETRIA MOLINA CARRANZA,, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JENIFER CARRANZA MOLINA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against FELIX J SALDANA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2989

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARREDONDO TORRES ADELIADO

MOLINA CARRANZA DEMETRIA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JENIFER CARRANZA MOLINA

DE LOS ANGELES CARRANZA MOLINA MARIA

Defendants

FLORES DANIEL

PRIME MANAGEMENT GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SALDANA FELIX J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RILEY GRANT K.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

5/18/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JOCELINE

5/4/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JOCELINE

Notice of Change of Firm Name

5/10/2021: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FR JENIFER

4/8/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FR JENIFER

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/9/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/9/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/5/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2021
  • Hearing07/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • Hearing07/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Demetria Molina Carranza,, individually and as Guardian ad Litem for Jenifer Carranza Molina (Plaintiff); Jenifer Carranza Molina (Plaintiff); Joceline Carranza Molina (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Demetria Molina Carranza,, individually and as Guardian ad Litem for Jenifer Carranza Molina (Plaintiff); Jenifer Carranza Molina (Plaintiff); Joceline Carranza Molina (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Demetria Molina Carranza,, individually and as Guardian ad Litem for Jenifer Carranza Molina (Plaintiff); Jenifer Carranza Molina (Plaintiff); Joceline Carranza Molina (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Joceline); Filed by Demetria Molina Carranza,, individually and as Guardian ad Litem for Jenifer Carranza Molina (Plaintiff); Jenifer Carranza Molina (Plaintiff); Joceline Carranza Molina (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (fr Jenifer); Filed by Demetria Molina Carranza,, individually and as Guardian ad Litem for Jenifer Carranza Molina (Plaintiff); Jenifer Carranza Molina (Plaintiff); Joceline Carranza Molina (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Demetria Molina Carranza,, individually and as Guardian ad Litem for Jenifer Carranza Molina (Plaintiff); Jenifer Carranza Molina (Plaintiff); Joceline Carranza Molina (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Demetria Molina Carranza,, individually and as Guardian ad Litem for Jenifer Carranza Molina (Plaintiff); Jenifer Carranza Molina (Plaintiff); Joceline Carranza Molina (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Primo Management Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RILEY GRANT K.