This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2019 at 11:27:46 (UTC).

DEMETRA DUELL VS ENTERPRISE RENT A CAR ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/02/2017 DEMETRA DUELL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ENTERPRISE RENT A CAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9849

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUELL DEMETRA

Defendants

ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR

RAMBO ANGELA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

MIFFLIN KEN ESQ.

MIFFLIN KEN

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

MILLER SCOTT D. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

5/2/2017: COMPLAINT-PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

SUMMONS

5/2/2017: SUMMONS

DECLARATION OF SCOTT D. MILLER

10/17/2017: DECLARATION OF SCOTT D. MILLER

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/24/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/19/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Unknown

11/29/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

11/29/2018: Minute Order

Proof of Personal Service

11/7/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order

10/16/2018: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Demetra Duell (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Demetra Duell (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (, alternatively Trial Setting Conference) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service , al...) of 11/29/2018); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service , al...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Demetra Duell (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-10-16 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Demetra Duell (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Enterprise Rent-A-Car (Defendant); Angela Rambo (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION OF SCOTT D. MILLER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Demetra Duell (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****9849    Hearing Date: December 02, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

demetria duell,

Plaintiff,

v.

enterprise rent-a-car, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: ****9849

Hearing Date: December 2, 2019

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion for leave to intervene by enterprise rent-a-car company of los angeles, llc

Proposed Intervenor Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC (“Intervenor”) seeks leave to intervene in this action per Code of Civil Procedure section 387. Intervenor served this motion on Plaintiff Demetria Duell (“Plaintiff”) on November 7, 2019 by mail. That is not sufficient notice. (Code Civ. Proc., ; 1005, subd. (b).) Plaintiff has not opposed the motion, and therefore has not waived any defect in notice. Accordingly, the motion is continued to December 10, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. The Court also continues the trial setting conference and final status conference to December 10, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. The Court’s clerk shall provide notice.

DATED: December 2, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR is a litigant